RI H5703 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that election supplies furnished by the board of elections would be delivered to or picked up by the proper officer as determined by the board no later than twelve o'clock p.m. (12:00 p.m.) on the day before the election.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment And Supplies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2017) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-01 | House | House read and passed |
2017-05-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/01/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |