RI H5702 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that persons who apply to the DMV for a driver's license, its renewal or personal identification document shall simultaneously register to vote, unless they expressly decline to do so.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Voters

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18HouseSigned by Governor
2017-07-13HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-30SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017)
2017-06-29SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2017-06-27SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017)
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2017-05-31HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-05-26HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/31/2017)
2017-05-24HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-05-19HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2017)
2017-03-21HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2017)
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback