RI H5695 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Courts - Traffic Tribunal (would Change The Manner In Which The Compensation Of Magistrates Of The Traffic Tribunal Is Determined.)
Title
An Act Relating To Courts And Civil Procedure - Courts - Traffic Tribunal (would Change The Manner In Which The Compensation Of Magistrates Of The Traffic Tribunal Is Determined.)
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-26 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013) |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5695.pdf |