RI H5684 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts individuals validly licensed in their country and holding a validly issued study or work Visa from the State's licensing requirements.
Title
Operators' And Chauffeurs' Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |