RI H5676 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "Rhode Island Terminally Ill Patient's Right to Try Act of 2017," which establishes the conditions for the use of experimental treatments for terminally ill patients.
Title
Treatment For Patients With Terminal Illness--the Rhode Island Terminally Ill Patients' Right To Try Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (06/15/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2017-04-13 | House | House read and passed |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/13/2017) |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/05/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |