RI H5675 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Miscellaneous Rules (would Increase The Penalty For Second Or Subsequent Violations Of The Offense Of Texting While Driving To Include The Suspension Of An Operator's Driving License In The Discretion Of The Ri Traffic Tribunal In Addition To A Monetary Fine)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Miscellaneous Rules (would Increase The Penalty For Second Or Subsequent Violations Of The Offense Of Texting While Driving To Include The Suspension Of An Operator's Driving License In The Discretion Of The Ri Traffic Tribunal In Addition To A Monetary Fine)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-04-09 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2013) |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-03-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/02/2013) |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5675.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5675A.pdf |