RI H5656 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Nurses (would Amend And Greatly Expand The Role And Duties Of Certain Types Of Nurses In The Health Care Profession, Especially The Role And Authority Of Advance Practice Registered Nurses.)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Nurses (would Amend And Greatly Expand The Role And Duties Of Certain Types Of Nurses In The Health Care Profession, Especially The Role And Authority Of Advance Practice Registered Nurses.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2013) |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2013-05-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2013) |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2013) |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2013-04-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2013) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5656.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5656A.pdf |