RI H5639 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that any solid waste collected and disposed of by, or on behalf of the district, shall be charged the same tipping fee per ton as the municipal rate and require the waste hauler to certify the tonnage at the time of disposal.
Title
Rhode Island Resource Recovery Corporation
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | House read and passed |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2019) |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019) |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |