RI H5621 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires professional solicitors and fund-raisers to disclose name of employer and percentage of contribution solicited by the fundraiser that will be retained by fundraising company. Requires that a specific statement be made with all solicitations.
Title
Solicitation By Charitable Organizations
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5621.pdf |