RI H5607 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waives primary care provider referral requirement to health care professional or specialist under certain conditions effective January 1, 2022.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] |
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2021) |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5607.pdf |