RI H5607 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As "growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island" (creates A Twenty Member "growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island" Commission To Examine, Evaluate And Provide Recommendations To Manage And Grow Rhode Island's Tourism Economy, And Would Report Back By January 5, 2021, And Expire On March 5, 2021.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Be Known As "growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island" (creates A Twenty Member "growing Tourism In The State Of Rhode Island" Commission To Examine, Evaluate And Provide Recommendations To Manage And Grow Rhode Island's Tourism Economy, And Would Report Back By January 5, 2021, And Expire On March 5, 2021.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019) |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5607.pdf |