RI H5607 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/23/2017)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/23/2017)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines geoengineering and requires permission of director of DEM to implement solar radiation management and climate geoengineering.
Title
Geoengineering
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (03/23/2017) |
2017-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5607.pdf |