RI H5601 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that on and after 7/1/15, any city or town council would have the authority to exempt said city or town from the prohibition against the issuance of certain alcoholic beverage licenses within 200' feet of a school or place of public worship.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5601.pdf |