RI H5600 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-04 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes the general assembly elections within the category of elections subject to the risk- limiting audits within the jurisdiction of the board of elections.
Title
Conduct Of Election And Voting Equipment, And Supplies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-03 | House | House read and passed |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/03/2021) |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |