RI H5581 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows recovery of damages for the emotional distress, grief, and loss of enjoyment of life as a result of the wrongful death of a spouse, a parent or a son or daughter.
Title
Procedure In Particular Actions - Death By Wrongful Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-16 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2021) |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |