RI H5580 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting Dates For The Joint Resolutions Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Disabilities Council Examine And Refine Its Current Policies And Practices (extends The Reporting Dates For The Joint Resolutions Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Disabilities Council To Examine And Refine Its Current Policies And Practices From January 5, 2015, To April 10, 2015.)
Title
Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting Dates For The Joint Resolutions Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Disabilities Council Examine And Refine Its Current Policies And Practices (extends The Reporting Dates For The Joint Resolutions Respectfully Requesting The Rhode Island Disabilities Council To Examine And Refine Its Current Policies And Practices From January 5, 2015, To April 10, 2015.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - House - Passage as amended in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - The ri disabilities council approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - The ri disabilities council approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2015-06-25 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2015-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/25/2015) |
2015-04-09 | House | House read and passed |
2015-04-02 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/09/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2015) |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |