RI H5561 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department to establish a database which monitors copayments owed by families receiving child care assistance. There is no cost to certified family-child care providers and a reasonable fee to providers not receiving payments.
Title
Relating To Human Services-child Care-state Subsidies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5561.pdf |