RI H5555 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a system for the regulation and taxation for adult use and cultivation of marijuana.
Title
Adult Use Of Cannabis Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
Rep. Moira Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5555.pdf |