RI H5550 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all cosmetics manufactured, sold, delivered, or held for offering to be sold contain a label that completely and accurately lists all of its component ingredient.
Title
Cosmetic Labeling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021) |
2021-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5550.pdf |