RI H5550 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Student Journalists' Freedom of Expression Act protecting student journalists' right to exercise freedom of speech in school-sponsored media.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Journalists' Freedom Of Expression Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18HouseSigned by Governor
2017-07-13HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-06-30SenateSenate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2017-06-30SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
2017-06-29HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2017-06-29HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/29/2017)
2017-06-29HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-29HouseScheduled for consideration (06/29/2017)
2017-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2017)
2017-02-16HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback