RI H5532 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes the exception to qualification for a broker's license previously granted those with a baccalaureate in real estate.
Title
Real Estate Brokers And Salespersons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-19 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-10-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-09-19 | House | House read and passed |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-03-13 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2017) |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |