RI H5523 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the licensing fee to $500 for any distillery producing less than 50,000 gallons per year and grants a tax exemption to distilleries doing business in RI for at least 12 months.
Title
Manufacturing And Wholesale Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5523.pdf |