RI H5514 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a specific appropriation for twelve million five hundred thousand dollars ($12,500,000) to be used by the housing resources commission in addition to the revenue generated from the current tax.
Title
Rhode Island Housing Resources Act Of 1998
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5514.pdf |