RI H5510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limits access to firearms when an individual is under certain types of domestic restraining orders or protective orders issued or renewed on or after July 1, 2017.
Title
Domestic Assault - Protect Rhode Island Families Act
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-30 - Senate - Protect rhode island families act lc1499/2 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-09-19 | House | House passed Sub B as amended in concurrence |
2017-09-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (09/19/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2017) |
2017-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2017) |
2017-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |