RI H5506 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that a fifteen percent (15%) minimum markup be added to the total cost of cigarettes sold by retailers.
Title
Cigarette Tax-minimum Price Of Cigarettes
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5506.pdf |