RI H5492 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Examine The State's Growing Home School Population And Provide Recommendations To Ensure That All Students Have Access To All Available Services In Order To Maximize Their Education (creates An 11 Member Commission To Examine The Home School Population And Make Recommendations For All Students To Have Access To Services To Maximize Their Education, And Would Report Back By January 4, 2022 And Expire On April 4, 2022.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Examine The State's Growing Home School Population And Provide Recommendations To Ensure That All Students Have Access To All Available Services In Order To Maximize Their Education (creates An 11 Member Commission To Examine The Home School Population And Make Recommendations For All Students To Have Access To Services To Maximize Their Education, And Would Report Back By January 4, 2022 And Expire On April 4, 2022.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021) |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5492.pdf |