RI H5492 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the fine imposed for reinstatement of the license or registration of an owner of a motor vehicle following the revocation or suspension of the license or registration for failure to maintain financial security.
Title
Motor Vehicles Reparations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2017) |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5492.pdf |