RI H5491 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification (would Provide The Court With Authority To Raise, Lower, Or Affirm The Level Of Community Notification In Sexual Offenses Offender Registration Hearings)
Title
An Act Relating To Criminal Offenses - Sexual Offender Registration And Community Notification (would Provide The Court With Authority To Raise, Lower, Or Affirm The Level Of Community Notification In Sexual Offenses Offender Registration Hearings)
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2013) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5491.pdf |