RI H5461 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an annual appropriation to be given to the state conservation committee.
Title
Soil Conservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2017) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5461.pdf |