RI H5461 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- General Powers: would authorize any municipal recreation department to request a background check from their local police department for any employee or volunteer serving their community
Title
An Act Relating To Towns And Cities -- General Powers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | House read and passed | |
2011-06-28 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-28 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-06-28 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-23 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-16 | Committee transferred to House Judiciary | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H5461.pdf |