RI H5457 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act In Amendment Of An Act Entitled "an Act To Incorporate The Rhode Island Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals," Passed At The May Session, 1870, As Amended
Title
An Act In Amendment Of An Act Entitled "an Act To Incorporate The Rhode Island Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals," Passed At The May Session, 1870, As Amended
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. John Lombardi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/27/2013) |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2013) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-05-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2013) |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-04-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee transferred to House Municipal Government |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5457.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5457A.pdf |