RI H5453 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Create The Limited Lines Travel Insurance Act To Establish Requirements For Travel Insurance Producers And Travel Agents Who Facilitate The Purchase Of Travel Insurance)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Create The Limited Lines Travel Insurance Act To Establish Requirements For Travel Insurance Producers And Travel Agents Who Facilitate The Purchase Of Travel Insurance)
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Larry Valencia [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/25/2013) |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2013-05-22 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-05-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/22/2013) |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2013) |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2013) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5453.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5453A.pdf |