RI H5448 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a Medicaid employees assessment and would require all for profit employers with more than 300 employees to compensate the state 10% of each of their employees' wages, capped of $1500, who are enrolled in Medicaid.
Title
Medicaid Employer Assessment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/15/2021) |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5448.pdf |