RI H5448 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Meeting postponed (06/27/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-25 - Meeting postponed (06/27/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts recoverable plastics from materials classified as solid waste/provides for converting of recoverable plastics into valuable raw materials.
Title
Refuse Disposal - Exempting Post-use Polymers, Gasification Processes And Recoverable Feed Stocks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | House | Meeting postponed (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Meeting postponed (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2019-06-25 | House | Committee transferred to House Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-02-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5448.pdf |