RI H5443 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulates fiduciary and designated recipient access to digital assets relating to probate practice and procedure by creating the "Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act" to promote uniformity of the law among states that enact it.
Title
Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access To Digital Assets Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2017) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5443.pdf |