RI H5433 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires default notices to lessees of self-service storage facilities to be sent to the lesseeās last known address, and would require and advertisement of the sale of personal property to be published once on a publicly accessible website.
Title
Self-service Storage Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-06-14 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2023-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2023) |
2023-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-06-12 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-06-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2023) |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2023) |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |