RI H5426 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-10 - House voted to recommit to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-10 - House voted to recommit to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Gives the contractor's registration and licensing board jurisdiction over pump installers, and/or water filtration/treatment system contractors.
Title
Rhode Island Well Drilling Contractors Licensing Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | House | House voted to recommit to House Corporations |
2015-05-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2015) |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2015-05-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2015) |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015) |
2015-03-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5426.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5426A.pdf |