RI H5421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special House Commission To Study Implementation Of A Food Recovery Incentive Program (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Develop Recommendations To Implement Incentives To Increase Food Recovery And Donations In The State, And Would Report Back To The House By March 7, 2018, And Expire On June 7, 2018.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special House Commission To Study Implementation Of A Food Recovery Incentive Program (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study And Develop Recommendations To Implement Incentives To Increase Food Recovery And Donations In The State, And Would Report Back To The House By March 7, 2018, And Expire On June 7, 2018.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | House read and passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2017) |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2017) |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |