RI H5413 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the trade-in values of motorcycles from sales tax and exempts from the state sales tax the trade-in value of any pickup truck under eight thousand one hundred pounds (8,100 lbs.) gross weight.
Title
The Motor Vehicle Sales Tax Equity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5413.pdf |