RI H5413 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the walking of any domestic animal on the grounds of the Veterans' Memorial Cemetery in Exeter with an exception for certified service dogs.
Title
Burial Of Veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Gallison [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2015) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5413.pdf |