RI H5407 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the general assembly and any governmental or quasi-governmental entity created by it, from issuing moral obligation bonds not secured by the full faith and credit of the state or revenues.
Title
Public Corporation Debt Management
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
Rep. John Lyle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5407.pdf |