RI H5390 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Human Services - Behavioral Health Care, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals - Community Residences (would Set A Minimum Wage And Benefits Scale For Employees Of Private Providers Operating Community Residences, Commencing July 1, 2015)
Title
An Act Relating To Human Services - Behavioral Health Care, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals - Community Residences (would Set A Minimum Wage And Benefits Scale For Employees Of Private Providers Operating Community Residences, Commencing July 1, 2015)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2013) |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5390.pdf |