RI H5387 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes designated state and local election officials with supervisory responsibility over polling locations the use of amber flashing safety lights on their vehicles.
Title
Lighting Equipment And Reflectors
Sponsors
Rep. Jacquelyn Baginski [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Barbara Ann Fenton-Fung [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5387.pdf |