RI H5380 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from the sales and use tax the sale of beer and malt beverages at retail.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation - Beer And Malt Beverages
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5380.pdf |