RI H5369 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waives the adoption fee to adopt a dog or cat from a public animal shelter for a veteran that presents a current and valid driver’s license or identification card with the word “veteran” printed on its face.
Title
Animal Care
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. David Place [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2021) |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5369.pdf |