RI H5351 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires elementary/secondary schools to have at least 1 school employee trained to administer/assist with the self-administering of seizure rescue medication prescribed to treat seizure disorder systems and the use of prescribed electrical stimulation.
Title
Seizure Safe Schools Act
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Rep. Liana Cassar [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/14/2021) |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/03/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5351.pdf |