RI H5348 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-15 - Referred to Senate Labor
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires retail establishments with 3 or more employees on the premises without accessible public restroom to allow customers suffering from eligible conditions access to their employee restrooms.
Title
Restroom Access Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2023-03-29 | House | House read and passed |
2023-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2023) |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/21/2023) |
2023-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2023) |
2023-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |