RI H5320 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education - Staffing (would Require All Public Schools In Grades Kindergarten Through Twelve (12), To Have At Least One Full-time Certified School Social Worker For Every Four Hundred (400) Students)
Title
An Act Relating To Education - Staffing (would Require All Public Schools In Grades Kindergarten Through Twelve (12), To Have At Least One Full-time Certified School Social Worker For Every Four Hundred (400) Students)
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Maria Cimini [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2013) |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5320.pdf |