RI H5314 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires screening for dyslexia and related disorders for public school students in grades kindergarten through grade four (K-4) and would provide for instruction in cursive writing.
Title
Chiara's Law -- Screening And Education Of Children With Dyslexia
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
Rep. Justin Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2021) |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5314.pdf |