RI H5277 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enables the auditor general to take under investigation any matter within the scope of an audit.
Title
Auditor General
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Daniel Reilly [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2015) |
2015-03-02 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/03/2015) |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5277.pdf |